Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 921 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3086 Week
» 3086 Month
» 69948 Year
» 1735324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 999 m/e 04/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5999 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4306 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64306 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/104/1902
J11/4 (0-6-0)10/1932
J11/1 (0-6-0)07/1937
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1939
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6061
To Service During 04/1902
Withdrawal Sat 23/08/1958
Service Life 56 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1902
39A   Gorton w/e 23/06/1951
     Withdrawn on 23/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 23/06/1951
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 23/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 999
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6061
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5999    
02/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4306    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64306    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
23/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 64306    

prev