Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 59 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4531 Week
» 23432 Month
» 23432 Year
» 1688808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1000 m/e 04/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6000 m/e 06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4307 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 64307 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/104/1902
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1932
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6062
To Service During 04/1902
Withdrawal Mon 04/07/1955
Service Life 53 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1902
40D Tuxford 4w/e 18/10/1952
40B Immingham 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn on 04/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   on 04/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1915 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1000
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6062
   
04/1915 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6000    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4307    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64307    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 64307    

prev prev