Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 88 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 88 Week
» 26709 Month
» 26709 Year
» 1692085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1006 m/e 04/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6006 m/e 06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4313 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 64313 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/104/1902
J11/4 (0-6-0)06/1930
J11/5 (0-6-0)03/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6068
To Service During 04/1902
Withdrawal Thu 18/05/1961
Service Life 59 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1902
38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/12/1953
   Withdrawn on 18/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   on 18/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1914 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1006
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6068
   
11/1914 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6006    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4313    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64313    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
18/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64313    

prev prev