Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 186 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3575 Week
» 22476 Month
» 22476 Year
» 1687852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1008 m/e 04/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6008 m/e 02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4315 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64315 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/104/1902
J11/4 (0-6-0)02/1943
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6070
To Service During 04/1902
Withdrawal Tue 19/04/1960
Service Life 58 yrs , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1902
36C Frodingham 4w/e 08/01/1958
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 01/08/1959
   Withdrawn on 19/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 08/08/1959
WDN   on 19/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1943 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1008
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6070
   
02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6008    
02/1943 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4315    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64315    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64315    

prev prev