Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 142 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1211 Week
» 1211 Month
» 68073 Year
» 1733449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 203 m/e 10/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5203 m/e 05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4331 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64331 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/210/1903
J11/4 (0-6-0)01/1934
J11/5 (0-6-0)10/1936
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4523
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Sat 30/01/1960
Service Life 56 yrs , 4 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1903
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 06/09/1952
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/09/1952
9G   Gorton w/e 14/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 30/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 06/09/1952
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 28/02/1959
WDN   w/e 30/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/12/1958 Rugby Works 42451(26A), 73137(15C), 75052(1E), 90576 (26A), 61853(2F), 64331(2F). SLS/195902
21/02/1959 Woodford Halse MPD On 21st February J11s 64331/418/28 were exchanged for MR 3Fs 43330/89/94 and these are employed on 'trip' work. SLS/195904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 203
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4523
   
05/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5203    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4331    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64331    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
30/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64331    

prev prev