Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 576 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6187 Week
» 17233 Month
» 17233 Year
» 1682609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 205 m/e 10/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5205 m/e 11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4332 m/e 02/1946
British Railways 64332 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/210/1903
J11/1 (0-6-0)11/1925
J11/2 (0-6-0)05/1936
J11/5 (0-6-0)11/1941
J11/4 (0-6-0)02/1942
J11/3 (0-6-0)08/1946
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4524
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1903
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/02/1958
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 04/02/1961
   Withdrawn on 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1941 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 205
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4524
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5205    
11/1941 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4332    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64332    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
04/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64332    

prev prev