Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 106 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4598 Week
» 29432 Month
» 63764 Year
» 1729140 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 206 m/e 10/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5206 m/e 05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4333 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 64333 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/210/1903
J11/4 (0-6-0)07/1941
J11/3 (0-6-0)11/1945
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4525
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Thu 09/08/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1903
GOR   Gorton w/e 05/03/1949
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/02/1958
40D   Tuxford 4w/e 08/03/1958
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 07/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 09/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 09/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1941 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 206
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4525
   
05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5206    
07/1941 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4333    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64333    
05/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
09/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64333    

prev prev