Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 441 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4913 Week
» 23814 Month
» 23814 Year
» 1689190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 211 m/e 10/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5211 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4336 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 64336 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/210/1903
J11/4 (0-6-0)09/1934
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4528
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1959
Service Life 55 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1903
38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/01/1952
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
WDN   on 13/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1934 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 211
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4528
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5211    
09/1934 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4336    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64336    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
13/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64336    

prev prev