Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 269 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2538 Week
» 21439 Month
» 21439 Year
» 1686815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 214 m/e 11/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5214 m/e 09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4337 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 64337 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4529
To Service During 11/1903
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1961
Service Life 57 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1903
39A Gorton 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 24/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC TUX Tuxford w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1928 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 214
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4529
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5214    
06/1928 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4337    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64337    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
24/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64337    

prev prev