Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 151 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3540 Week
» 22441 Month
» 22441 Year
» 1687817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 215 m/e 11/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5215 m/e 08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4338 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 64338 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/211/1903
J11/4 (0-6-0)08/1939
J11/5 (0-6-0)12/1946
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4530
To Service During 11/1903
Withdrawal Mon 20/10/1958
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1903
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
38A Colwick 6w/e 25/12/1954
38C Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 22/10/1955
38A Colwick 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn on 20/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 15/09/1956
WDN   on 20/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1939 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 215
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4530
   
08/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5215    
08/1939 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4338    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64338    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 64338    

prev prev