Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 155 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3544 Week
» 22445 Month
» 22445 Year
» 1687821 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 219 m/e 02/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5219 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4341 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 64341 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/202/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)06/1934
J11/5 (0-6-0)05/1940
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4545
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal Sat 04/02/1961
Service Life 57 yrs , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1904
9G Gorton 4w/e 12/04/1958
   Withdrawn on 04/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9H Gorton 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC LMR   4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   w/e 04/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1928 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 219
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4545
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5219    
07/1928 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4341    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64341    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
04/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64341    

prev prev