Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 344 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4816 Week
» 23717 Month
» 23717 Year
» 1689093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 225 m/e 04/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5225 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4346 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64346 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)09/1934
J11/3 (0-6-0)08/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4550
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
40D Tuxford 4w/e 08/02/1958
9G Gorton w/e 20/12/1958
41K Tuxford w/e 17/01/1959
41K Tuxford w/e 31/01/1959
41J Langwith Junction w/e 07/02/1959
40A Lincoln w/e 23/05/1959
   Withdrawn on 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 9G Gorton 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
EXLOAN 41K Tuxford 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 13/06/1959
WDN   on 23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1915 Superheated boiler fitted
12/1924 Saturated Boiler Fitted
09/1934 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 225
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4550
   
02/1915 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
12/1924 Modification Modification: Saturated boiler fitted    
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5225    
09/1934 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4346    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64346    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
17/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (41K)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (41K)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64346    

prev