Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 892 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6503 Week
» 17549 Month
» 17549 Year
» 1682925 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 227 m/e 04/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5227 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4348 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64348 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1904
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1928
J11/4 (0-6-0)11/1932
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4552
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal Fri 11/03/1960
Service Life 55 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/03/1952
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 19/01/1957
40E Colwick w/e 10/01/1959
   Withdrawn on 11/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 24/01/1959
WDN   on 11/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1916 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/01/1954 Darlington MPD 78010/1 are working from West Auckland on Tebay mineral traffic and 65092 has gone to Kirkby Stephen for their Darlington passenger job. No. 45719 Glorious worked a down passenger through here on 9th January, and 64348 two trips York-Darlington the same week-end. SLS/195402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 227
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4552
   
01/1916 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5227    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4348    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64348    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
11/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64348    

prev