Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 322 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18125 Week
» 71141 Month
» 190668 Year
» 3217521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
228 |
m/e |
04/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5228 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4349 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64349 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4553 |
To Service |
During 04/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/10/1957 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1904 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
36D |
|
Barnsley |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
39A |
|
Gorton |
5w/e |
17/12/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/10/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DON |
Doncaster |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/10/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1926 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 228 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4553 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5228 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4349 |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64349 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
16/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64349 |
|
|