Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 285 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5896 Week
» 16942 Month
» 16942 Year
» 1682318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 230 m/e 04/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5230 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4351 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64351 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1904
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1928
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1932
J11/5 (0-6-0)10/1949
J11/4 (0-6-0)01/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4555
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal Fri 30/10/1959
Service Life 55 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
36C Frodingham 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   on 30/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 230
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4555
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5230    
06/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4351    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64351    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
30/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64351    

prev prev