Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 186 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3575 Week
» 22476 Month
» 22476 Year
» 1687852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 231 m/e 04/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5231 m/e 04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4352 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 64352 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1904
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1928
J11/4 (0-6-0)02/1934
J11/1 (0-6-0)03/1939
J11/3 (0-6-0)04/1945
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4556
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal Tue 29/08/1961
Service Life 57 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
38B Annesley 4w/e 18/05/1957
38A Colwick 4w/e 09/11/1957
40D Tuxford 4w/e 08/02/1958
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/03/1958
   Withdrawn on 29/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 22/02/1958
WDN   on 29/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1927 Superheated boiler fitted
03/1939 Saturated Boiler Fitted
04/1945 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 231
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4556
   
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5231    
07/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
03/1939 Modification Modification: Saturated boiler fitted    
04/1945 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4352    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64352    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
29/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64352    

prev prev