Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 321 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 3674 Week
» 30295 Month
» 30295 Year
» 1695671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 234 m/e 04/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5234 m/e 03/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4353 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 64353 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)07/1933
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4557
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal Mon 10/02/1958
Service Life 53 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
39A Gorton 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 10/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
WDN   on 10/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 234
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4557
   
03/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5234    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4353    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 64353    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
10/02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 64353    

prev prev