Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 144 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3533 Week
» 22434 Month
» 22434 Year
» 1687810 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 177 m/e 11/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5177 m/e 11/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4354 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 64354 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/211/1903
J11/4 (0-6-0)08/1941
J11/3 (0-6-0)09/1943
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1903
Withdrawal Sun 21/10/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1903
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/05/1957
40D Tuxford 4w/e 08/02/1958
41J Langwith Junction w/e 07/02/1959
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 04/07/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 02/04/1960
   Withdrawn on 21/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   on 21/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1941 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton MPD Ex-Works on Gorton (9G) Shed: 63617, 63744, 63805, 64354, 90111. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 177
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5177    
08/1941 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4354    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64354    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
21/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64354    

prev prev