Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 971 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2143 Week
» 21044 Month
» 21044 Year
» 1686420 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 220 m/e 03/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5220 m/e 09/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4361 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 64361 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/203/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)03/1937
J11/5 (0-6-0)11/1951
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1904
Withdrawal Wed 25/03/1959
Service Life 55 yrs , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1904
38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/08/1955
38A Colwick 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn on 25/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LEI Leicester (G.C.) w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   on 25/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1937 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 220
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5220    
03/1937 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4361    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64361    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64361    

prev prev