Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 270 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2539 Week
» 21440 Month
» 21440 Year
» 1686816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 232 m/e 04/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5232 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4362 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 64362 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1904
J11/5 (0-6-0)12/1944
J11/3 (0-6-0)09/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 16/08/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 23/05/1959
   Withdrawn on 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 13/06/1959
WDN   on 23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1944 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/09/1947 Gorton Works 13/9: No. 4362 is now rebuilt to Class 'J11/4' and carries a standard 'J11' boiler No. 47/4046 with an extension welded on to the lower part of the firebox due to the boiler centre line being raised. A new set of Class 'A5' frames was seen in the Erecting Shop; un-marked so it was impossible to ascertain for which engine it is intended. Two boilers off Class 'Cl' 4434 and 4443 (Nos. 8663 and 8035, now pressed at 100lb.) were in the boiler yard, presumably for use as stationary boilers in due course. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 232
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5232    
12/1944 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4362    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64362    
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64362    

prev prev