Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 217 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2486 Week
» 21387 Month
» 21387 Year
» 1686763 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 240 m/e 07/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5240 m/e 04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4364 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 64364 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/207/1904
J11/1 (0-6-0)04/1925
J11/4 (0-6-0)07/1935
J11/3 (0-6-0)03/1943
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal Tue 25/07/1961
Service Life 57 yrs , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1904
38B Annesley 4w/e 20/08/1955
38A Colwick 4w/e 21/09/1957
38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 19/10/1957
40D Tuxford 4w/e 08/02/1958
41J Langwith Junction w/e 07/02/1959
   Withdrawn on 25/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse on 29/06/1947
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 25/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1923 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 240
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
02/1923 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5240    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4364    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64364    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
25/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64364    

prev prev