Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 99 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4591 Week
» 29425 Month
» 63757 Year
» 1729133 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 238 m/e 06/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5238 m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4369 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 64369 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/206/1904
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1928
J11/4 (0-6-0)04/1931
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1930
To Service During 06/1904
Withdrawal Thu 27/10/1955
Service Life 51 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1904
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/12/1953
     Withdrawn on 27/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   on 27/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/06/1951 S.M.J. line. This is being converted to a goods line, and LNE and GW crews are working a through goods service. J11 No. 64369 has been to Stratford on at least two (if not four) Sundays with men learning the road from Woodford: the W.R. crew from Gloucester used a 2P 4-4-0 (LMS). Regular trains are being hauled by 8F WD 2-8-0's, two from 85A being noted on Tuesday morning 12th June. SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 238
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1930
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5238    
06/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4369    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64369    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
27/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 64369    

prev prev