Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 558 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 558 Week
» 8170 Month
» 75032 Year
» 1740408 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 242 m/e 07/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5242 m/e 02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4371 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 64371 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/207/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)07/1935
J11/5 (0-6-0)01/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1932
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal Mon 30/01/1961
Service Life 56 yrs , 7 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1904
LIN   Lincoln w/e 14/08/1948
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 23/05/1959
36C   Frodingham w/e 29/08/1959
     Withdrawn on 30/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 30/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1933 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 242
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1932
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5242    
01/1933 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4371    
14/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64371    
23/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
30/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64371    

prev prev