Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 959 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 959 Week
» 19860 Month
» 19860 Year
» 1685236 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 246 m/e 07/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5246 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4375 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 64375 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/40000
J11/2 (0-6-0)07/1904
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1928
J11/3 (0-6-0)01/1944
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1936
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1904
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/04/1953
38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 25/09/1954
38B Annesley 4w/e 19/10/1957
9G Gorton w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 34E Neasden m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 10/08/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1914 Superheated boiler fitted
12/1921 Saturated Boiler Fitted
04/1927 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 246
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1936
   
12/1914 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
12/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated boiler fitted    
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5246    
04/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4375    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64375    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64375    

prev prev