Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 95 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 95 Week
» 26716 Month
» 26716 Year
» 1692092 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 253 m/e 03/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5253 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4381 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 64381 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/203/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)05/1933
J11/5 (0-6-0)01/1946
J11/4 (0-6-0)11/1946
J11/5 (0-6-0)05/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 765
To Service During 03/1904
Withdrawal Fri 20/03/1959
Service Life 55 yrs , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1904
40A Lincoln 4w/e 18/10/1952
   Withdrawn on 20/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WRX Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   on 20/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1928 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 253
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 765
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5253    
09/1928 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4381    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64381    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64381    

prev prev