Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 915 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3080 Week
» 3080 Month
» 69942 Year
» 1735318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 254 m/e 03/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5254 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4382 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 64382 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/203/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)06/1939
J11/5 (0-6-0)04/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 766
To Service During 03/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/10/1959
Service Life 55 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1904
     Withdrawn w/e 31/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 31/07/1949
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 31/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1939 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 254
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 766
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5254    
06/1939 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4382    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64382    
31/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64382    

prev prev