Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 85 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 85 Week
» 26706 Month
» 26706 Year
» 1692082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1078 m/e 08/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6078 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4386 m/e 03/1946
British Railways 64386 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/208/1905
J11/4 (0-6-0)09/1933
J11/5 (0-6-0)08/1940
J11/3 (0-6-0)11/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 820
To Service During 08/1905
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962
Service Life 57 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1905
38B Annesley 4w/e 20/08/1955
40B Immingham 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn on 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   on 23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1078
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 820
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6078    
08/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4386    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64386    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64386    

prev prev