Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 916 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6527 Week
» 17573 Month
» 17573 Year
» 1682949 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1080 m/e 08/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6080 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4388 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 64388 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/208/1904
J11/4 (0-6-0)02/1934
J11/5 (0-6-0)10/1948
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 822
To Service During 08/1904
Withdrawal Thu 12/03/1959
Service Life 54 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1904
38A Colwick 5w/e 19/01/1957
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 12/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   on 12/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1925 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1905 Renumbered Renumbered to 1080    
05/1925 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6080    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4388    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64388    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
12/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64388    

prev prev