Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 387 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 2552 Month
» 69414 Year
» 1734790 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1081 m/e 09/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6081 m/e 01/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4389 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 64389 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/209/1905
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1932
J11/5 (0-6-0)03/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 823
To Service During 09/1905
Withdrawal Sat 23/01/1960
Service Life 54 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1905
39A   Gorton 4w/e 08/02/1958
     Withdrawn on 23/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 23/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1932 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1081
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 823
   
01/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6081    
12/1932 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4389    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64389    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
23/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64389    

prev