Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 87 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 87 Week
» 26708 Month
» 26708 Year
» 1692084 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1119 m/e 08/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6119 m/e 02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4395 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64395 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/208/1906
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1928
J11/5 (0-6-0)07/1946
J11/3 (0-6-0)04/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 858
To Service During 08/1906
Withdrawal Wed 31/01/1962
Service Life 55 yrs , 6 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1906
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 3w/e 14/05/1955
36C Frodingham w/e 28/11/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 15/10/1960
   Withdrawn on 31/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   on 31/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1946 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1119
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 858
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6119    
07/1946 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4395    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64395    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
31/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64395    

prev prev