Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 296 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 3649 Week
» 30270 Month
» 30270 Year
» 1695646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 282 m/e 12/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5282 m/e 02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4397 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 64397 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/212/1906
J11/4 (0-6-0)08/1943
J11/5 (0-6-0)04/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1906
Withdrawal Fri 06/05/1960
Service Life 53 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1906
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 14/02/1953
35A New England 4w/e 20/03/1954
38A Colwick 4w/e 21/08/1954
40A Lincoln w/e 19/03/1960
   Withdrawn on 06/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 35A New England 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/03/1960
WDN   on 06/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1943 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 282
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5282    
08/1943 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4397    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64397    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
06/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64397    

prev prev