Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 885 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6381 Week
» 25282 Month
» 25282 Year
» 1690658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 288 m/e 03/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5288 m/e 05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4403 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64403 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/203/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1925
J11/4 (0-6-0)09/1934
J11/5 (0-6-0)07/1936
J11/4 (0-6-0)02/1942
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal Mon 11/07/1960
Service Life 53 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1907
36A Doncaster 5w/e 23/08/1952
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 23/10/1954
41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/07/1958
41G Barnsley 4w/e 16/08/1958
41F Mexborough w/e 25/04/1959
   Withdrawn on 11/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 41G Barnsley 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   w/e 11/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1934 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 288
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5288    
09/1934 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4403    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 64403    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (41G)    
25/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
11/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64403    

prev prev