Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 541 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6152 Week
» 17198 Month
» 17198 Year
» 1682574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 289 m/e 03/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5289 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4404 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 64404 m/e 07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/203/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)11/1924
J11/4 (0-6-0)09/1933
J11/5 (0-6-0)04/1937
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal Mon 06/02/1961
Service Life 53 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1907
36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/03/1952
36D Barnsley 4w/e 16/03/1957
36C Frodingham w/e 29/08/1959
   Withdrawn on 06/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 06/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1915 Superheated boiler fitted
11/1924 Saturated Boiler Fitted
09/1933 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 289
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
02/1915 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
11/1924 Modification Modification: Saturated boiler fitted    
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5289    
09/1933 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4404    
07/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 64404    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
06/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64404    

prev prev