Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 578 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6189 Week
» 17235 Month
» 17235 Year
» 1682611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 290 m/e 03/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5290 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4405 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64405 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/203/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)06/1924
J11/5 (0-6-0)10/1939
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1942
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal Sat 23/04/1960
Service Life 53 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1907
40A Lincoln 4w/e 18/10/1952
40D Tuxford 5w/e 24/03/1956
39A Gorton 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 23/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 23/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1935 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 290
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5290    
06/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4405    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64405    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
23/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64405    

prev prev