Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 88 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 88 Week
» 26709 Month
» 26709 Year
» 1692085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 295 m/e 05/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5295 m/e 02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4410 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64410 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/205/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)06/1928
J11/4 (0-6-0)11/1932
J11/5 (0-6-0)10/1937
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1956
Service Life 49 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1907
36C Frodingham 4w/e 13/11/1954
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/11/1954
WDN   on 29/12/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 295
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5295    
06/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4410    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64410    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
29/12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 64410    

prev prev