Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2124 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19927 Week
» 72943 Month
» 192470 Year
» 3219323 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
295 |
m/e |
05/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5295 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4410 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64410 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1956 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1907 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
4w/e |
13/11/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DON |
Doncaster |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1930 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 295 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5295 |
|
|
06/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4410 |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64410 |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64410 |
|
|