Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 178 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3567 Week
» 22468 Month
» 22468 Year
» 1687844 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 302 m/e 08/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5302 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4417 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 64417 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/208/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1926
J11/4 (0-6-0)05/1935
J11/5 (0-6-0)09/1939
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1939
J11/3 (0-6-0)06/1943
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 08/1907
Withdrawal Tue 29/08/1961
Service Life 54 yrs , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1907
41F Mexborough w/e 09/01/1960
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 15/10/1960
   Withdrawn on 29/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 36D Barnsley w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   on 29/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1923 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 302
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
06/1923 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5302    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4417    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64417    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
29/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64417    

prev prev