Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 451 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6062 Week
» 17108 Month
» 17108 Year
» 1682484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 303 m/e 08/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5303 m/e 09/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4418 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 64418 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/208/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1927
J11/4 (0-6-0)08/1933
J11/5 (0-6-0)10/1936
J11/4 (0-6-0)06/1941
J11/3 (0-6-0)10/1945
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 08/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/11/1961
Service Life 54 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1907
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/06/1953
9G Gorton w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 25/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/06/1953
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 28/02/1959
WDN   w/e 25/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1931 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/02/1959 Woodford Halse MPD On 21st February J11s 64331/418/28 were exchanged for MR 3Fs 43330/89/94 and these are employed on 'trip' work. SLS/195904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 303
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5303    
01/1931 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4418    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64418    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
25/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64418    

prev prev