Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 559 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6170 Week
» 17216 Month
» 17216 Year
» 1682592 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 311 m/e 11/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5311 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4425 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 64425 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/211/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1924
J11/4 (0-6-0)08/1939
J11/5 (0-6-0)05/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1907
Withdrawal Tue 08/11/1960
Service Life 53 yrs , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1907
41F Mexborough w/e 09/01/1960
   Withdrawn on 08/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRN Barnsley w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 08/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1939 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 311
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5311    
08/1939 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4425    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64425    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
08/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64425    

prev prev