Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 300 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5911 Week
» 16957 Month
» 16957 Year
» 1682333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 314 m/e 11/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5314 m/e 09/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4428 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 64428 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/211/1907
J11/1 (0-6-0)09/1924
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1932
J11/5 (0-6-0)08/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1907
Withdrawal Sat 04/04/1959
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1907
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 19/01/1952
9G Gorton w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn on 04/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 26/01/1952
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 28/02/1959
WDN   w/e 04/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1932 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/02/1959 Woodford Halse MPD On 21st February J11s 64331/418/28 were exchanged for MR 3Fs 43330/89/94 and these are employed on 'trip' work. SLS/195904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 314
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5314    
12/1932 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4428    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64428    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
04/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64428    

prev prev