Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 209 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3598 Week
» 22499 Month
» 22499 Year
» 1687875 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 320 m/e 01/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5320 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4434 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 64434 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/201/1908
J11/1 (0-6-0)07/1925
J11/4 (0-6-0)06/1933
J11/5 (0-6-0)06/1939
J11/4 (0-6-0)07/1949
J11/5 (0-6-0)01/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1908
Withdrawal Sat 08/10/1960
Service Life 52 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1908
   Withdrawn on 08/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 08/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1928 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/09/1947 Gorton Works 13/9: No. 4362 is now rebuilt to Class 'J11/4' and carries a standard 'J11' boiler No. 47/4046 with an extension welded on to the lower part of the firebox due to the boiler centre line being raised. A new set of Class 'A5' frames was seen in the Erecting Shop; un-marked so it was impossible to ascertain for which engine it is intended. Two boilers off Class 'Cl' 4434 and 4443 (Nos. 8663 and 8035, now pressed at 100lb.) were in the boiler yard, presumably for use as stationary boilers in due course. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1908 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 320
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5320    
03/1928 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4434    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64434    
08/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64434    

prev prev