Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 90 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 90 Week
» 26711 Month
» 26711 Year
» 1692087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 325 m/e 04/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5325 m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4438 m/e 02/1946
British Railways 64438 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1908
J11/1 (0-6-0)04/1926
J11/4 (0-6-0)07/1932
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1908
Withdrawal Mon 11/01/1960
Service Life 51 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1908
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/04/1953
38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 25/09/1954
38A Colwick 5w/e 22/10/1955
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 17/11/1956
38A Colwick 5w/e 19/01/1957
   Withdrawn on 11/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34E Neasden m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   on 11/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1908 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 325
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5325    
04/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4438    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64438    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
11/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64438    

prev prev