Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2947 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16353 Week
» 69369 Month
» 188896 Year
» 3215749 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
326 |
m/e |
05/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5326 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4439 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
64439 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/02/1961 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1908 |
LTH |
|
Louth |
w/e |
03/01/1948 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
38B |
|
Annesley |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
9G |
|
Gorton |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/02/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LTH |
Louth |
w/e |
03/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
LOAN |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
23/02/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
9G |
Gorton |
5w/e |
02/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1932 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 326 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5326 |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4439 |
|
|
03/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (LTH) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64439 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
25/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64439 |
|
|