Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 88 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 88 Week
» 26709 Month
» 26709 Year
» 1692085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 327 m/e 06/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5327 m/e 04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4440 m/e 03/1946
British Railways 64440 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/206/1908
J11/1 (0-6-0)12/1928
J11/4 (0-6-0)02/1935
J11/5 (0-6-0)05/1943
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/12/1960
Service Life 52 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1908
   Withdrawn w/e 03/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton m/e 31/01/1946
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1927 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 327
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5327    
03/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4440    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64440    
03/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64440    

prev prev