Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 258 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4604 Week
» 4604 Month
» 71466 Year
» 1736842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 947 m/e 01/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5947 m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4445 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 64445 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/201/1910
J11/5 (0-6-0)11/1932
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1910
Withdrawal Fri 24/08/1962
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1910
40B   Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
39B   Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/01/1952
39B   Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 26/01/1952
     Withdrawn on 24/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   on 24/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1928 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1910 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 947
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5947    
08/1928 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4445    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64445    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
24/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64445    

prev prev