Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 96 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 96 Week
» 26717 Month
» 26717 Year
» 1692093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 955 m/e 05/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5955 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4453 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 64453 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/205/1910
J11/5 (0-6-0)02/1934
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1910
Withdrawal Mon 07/10/1957
Service Life 47 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1910
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/10/1952
34E Neasden 5w/e 17/01/1953
36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/04/1953
38A Colwick 4w/e 25/09/1954
38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn on 07/10/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NTH Northwich w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 15/09/1956
WDN   on 07/10/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1927 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1910 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 955
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5955    
04/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4453    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64453    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
07/10/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 64453    

prev