Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4332 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17738 Week
» 70754 Month
» 190281 Year
» 3217134 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
681 |
m/e |
02/1885 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7681 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
N16 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1885 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1932 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1932 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1885 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 681 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7681 |
|
|
10/1932 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7681 |
|
|
10/1932 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
12/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
17/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|