Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14116 Week
» 67132 Month
» 186659 Year
» 3213512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
886 |
m/e |
10/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7886 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5389 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65389 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y25 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 12/04/1960 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
on |
17/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
4w/e |
19/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 05/1935 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 886 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7886 |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5389 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65389 |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
12/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65389 |
|
|