Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
911 |
m/e |
11/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7911 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5405 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65405 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
N28 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/08/1958 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1938 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 04/1932 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/08/1958 |
Watlington branch |
Watlington branch goods services during week ending 2nd August were being worked by M.R. 2F 58131 (14A) whilst J15's 65391/405 were away u/r. |
SLS/195809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 911 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7911 |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1938 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5405 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65405 |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
16/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65405 |
|
|