Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 168 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17971 Week
» 70987 Month
» 190514 Year
» 3217367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
646 |
m/e |
08/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7646 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5446 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65446 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X45 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 08/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/12/1960 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 01/1932 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1946 |
General |
An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains |
SLS/194701 |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 646 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7646 |
|
|
01/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5446 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65446 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65446 |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|